Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
County Of Alameda, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Mckinley, Jeaniece Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Toni Mims Cochran presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeToni Mims Cochran Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2017 |
CategoryParental Relationship/Obligations |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions56 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2021 |
Notice of Motion for Modification
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Completed | |
July 08, 2021 |
Judge: Notice of Motion for Modification |
||
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing Filed | |
February 09, 2021 |
Notice of Motion for Modification
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
||
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | RFO - Family Law Commenced and Continued | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued to RFO - Family Law dept: 509 date: 07/08/2021 time: 01:00 PM | |
February 09, 2021 |
Judge: Notice of Motion for Modification |
||
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing Re: Notice of Motion for Modification Filed | |
December 08, 2020 |
Notice of Motion for Modification
Judge: Toni Mims-Cochran |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.