Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sablan-Korndorfer, Suzanne, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Korndorfer, William Paul, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Margaret Fujioka presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMargaret Fujioka Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 12, 2014 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions205 days |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counselor's Report Filed | |
February 17, 2021 |
Judge: Request for Order re: Modification... |
||
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Electronic Service Filed | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Findings and Order After Hearing re Child Custody,.. Filed | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter re Proposed Order re: Oct 7, 2020 Hearing Filed | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Order (REVISED) Filed | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Electronic Service Re: Declaration of Petitioner Suzanne Sablan in Response to Decl | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration of Petitioner Suzanne Sablan in Response to Declaration of Donal Casey Filed | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.