Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Braga, Genniva filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michelle Gilleece presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Exhibits List Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: April 07, 2022Order Appointing Guardian Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Ex Parte Application Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Trial Brief Filed
Date: May 10, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Ex Parte Application Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Document Received
Date: April 19, 2022Findings & Order After Hearing Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Exhibits List Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Motion Filed Re:
Date: March 02, 2022Motion Filed Re:
Date: March 02, 2022Declaration re:
Date: March 02, 2022Declaration re:
Date: March 02, 2022Declaration re:
Date: March 02, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: May 05, 2021Declaration re:
Date: March 02, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: May 06, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Declaration re:
Date: April 01, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Proof of Service
Date: December 20, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: September 01, 2021Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: April 05, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: April 05, 2021Objection Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Objection Filed
Date: August 20, 2021Duties of Guardian Form filed
Date: April 05, 2021Supplemental Report Filed
Date: May 12, 2021Petition and Party Information Entered (Guardianship)
Date: April 05, 2021Temporary Letters Issued
Date: May 12, 2021Consent of Guardian
Date: April 05, 2021Consent of Guardian
Date: April 05, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 12, 2021Temporary Letters Issued
Date: April 12, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 15, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 15, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 24, 2022Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: April 28, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 22, 2021Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 18, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 23, 2021Proof of Service
Date: May 03, 2022Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed
Date: May 17, 2022Proof of Service
Date: May 27, 2022Letters Issued - Person
Date: June 01, 2022Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Proof of Service
Date: May 10, 2022Proof of Service
Date: May 27, 2022Witness List Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Proof of Service
Date: June 01, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: August 24, 2021Letters Issued - Temporary
Date: January 11, 2022Parental Notification of Indian Status Filed
Date: April 05, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 05, 2021Declaration Under UCCJEA filed
Date: April 05, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: April 12, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: April 15, 2021Order Appointing Temporary Guardian Filed
Date: April 12, 2021Probate Notes - Hearing Date of
Date: May 06, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Subpoenas Destroyed | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Filed | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document Received - FAX: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY OF RECORD |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibits List Filed AMENDED |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Guardian Filed NO BOND REQ |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Letters Issued - Person | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service AMENDED EXHIBIT LIST VIA ELECTRONIC SERVICE AS TO GENNIVA LE BARAGA AND QUANG PETER HUYNH |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice Filed | |
June 01, 2022 |
Department S36 - SBJC
Judge: Gilleece, Michelle |
||
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Petition Granted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.