Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hartnell, Bryan Calvin filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Douglas K Mann presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas K Mann Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2023 |
Department F2 - Fontana
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: | |
July 11, 2023 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Report Filed REPORT BY COURT APPOINTED GUARDIAN AD LITEM |
|
March 28, 2023 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Mann, Douglas K |
||
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of Corrected Minute Order 03.28.2023 |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed | |
October 25, 2022 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Daniel, Jennifer |
||
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's office to provide copy of file to counsel | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney Appointed as Guardian Ad Litem - Donna Sue Ortiz is appointed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.