Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chris H. Stewart, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Per, against Mary R. Stewart, represented by Schneer, Richard A, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 24, 1989 |
CategoryPetn For Dissolution |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW COURT TRIAL ESTIMATED AT 03:00 HOURS. VACATED |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD B Y ANDREW ROSS ON BEHALF OF CHRIS H. STEWART WHO IS NOW APPEARING IN PRO/PER Not Applicable |
|
November 15, 2012 | Docket Event |
UPDATED CASE TO CHANGE ADDRESS OF PARTY CHRIS H. STEWART Not Applicable |
|
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ON RICHARD A SCHNEER FILED; SERVED ON 11/13/12 Not Applicable |
|
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE (WITH PREJUDICE) AS TO MOTION FILED ON 4/30/12 TO Not Applicable |
|
October 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION & ORDER RE: RESCHEDULING & TAKING DEPOSITION OF RESPONDENT FILED Not Applicable |
|
October 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
STIP & ORDER RE RESCHEDULING & TAKING DEPO OF RESP, MARY STEWART W/O FURTHER WRITTEN NOTICE Not Applicable |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER 8/29/12 HEARING ON RICHARD A SCHNEER, ESQ FILED; SERVED ON 10/03/12 Not Applicable |
|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION & ORDER RE ATTORNEYS FEES, PTNR SHALL PAY RESPS ATTRNY FILED Not Applicable |
|
September 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
STIP & ORDER RE: ATTORNEYS FEES SENT TO ATTORNEY P/U BOX "C" Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.