Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ghania Daoud, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mohammed Ramdane Daoud, in the jurisdiction of Contra Costa County. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts with Wendy McGuire Coats presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWendy McGuire Coats Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationContra Costa County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2026 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | HEARING ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR C/C, VISIT, S/S, A/F & COSTS ( ANNE D BONFIGLIO)(ATTY) - Minutes | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83) | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
HEARING ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR C/C, VISIT, S/S, A/F & COSTS ( ANNE D BONFIGLIO)(ATTY) - Minutes Complete |
|
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
FILE RETURNED TO COURT RECORDS, MARTINEZ Not Applicable |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
DECL. OF ANNE D. BONFIGLIO RE: SUPPORT CALCULATION S FILED Not Applicable |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
PTNR.S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK EPSTEIN CREDIT AN D WATTS REIMBURSEMENTS FILED Not Applicable |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY GHANIA DAOUD Not Applicable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.