Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vue, Song, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Lor, Chieng, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Melanie K. Bendorf presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelanie K. Bendorf Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 25, 2020 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedDecember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Findings & Order After Hearing | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Request for Order Cont.
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Personal | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | FL Orientation Completed | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.