Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Rose, Annalee C, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Robison, Allen E, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Status Conference Statement | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.