Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Shriver, Richelle L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Shriver, John D, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 06, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial CT Family Law
Judge: Bendorf, Melanie K. |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Ptnr | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Property Declaration | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Income & Expense Declaration - Resp |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.