Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Celedon, Bertha Alicia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Celedon, Juan M, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerry N. Spies Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 03, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)(FL/CIV) | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Notice of Status/Case Mgmt Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration RE: Service of Declaration of Disclosure and I&E | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction Act |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.