Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nelson, Malia K., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mazon, Wiliam A., in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Terry N. Spies presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice Return of Documents (Fill-in) | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Mail | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Amended Petition Filed | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
October 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Return of Documents (Fill-in) | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Citation To Appear
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
FL Status/Case Management Conference
Judge: Spies, Terry N |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Return of Documents (Fill-in) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.