Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Murray, Geneva, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Murray, Kyle, in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Benjamin Z. Wirtschafter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenjamin Z. Wirtschafter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 18, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/ Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Cycle Time47 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Minutes | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Wirtschafter, Benjamin Z |
|
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Calendar | |
July 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Child Custody Recommending Counseling Report | |
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Mediation Orientation | |
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event | FL Orientation Completed | |
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | FL Orientation Completed | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Restraining Order After Hearing | |
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing On Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.