Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hand, Lori, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hand, Marsha, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with McAdam, Samuel T. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: May 25, 2021Request for Order - DV/TRO
Date: June 09, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation TO 6 MO RESTRAINING ORDER |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing (CLETS OAH) EXPIRES 12/17/2021 |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO TO BE HEARD AT 9:30AM Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To STIP AND ORDER AND RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING SENT TO CLERK IN D10 FOR 6/17/21 HEARING |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents STIPULATION AND ORDER |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lodging of Documents RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Proof of Electronic Service SERVED TARA ROJAS WITH COURT ENDORES ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING ON 6/14/2021 |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Disability Accommodation Request |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: McAdam, Samuel T. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.