Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Morales, Jorge Luna, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Morales, Rosa Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal pursuant to parties Stipulation reached in Case FL-2021-494 |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Lodged Document PET'S EXHIBITS - SENT TO CLERK IN D4 FOR 5/17/21 HEARING |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) 1ST AMENDED |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Request to Continue Hearing | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Response - No Fee | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED JORGE MORALES BY MAIL W/ RESPONSE ON 5/11/2021 |
|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service PERSONALLY SERVED ROSA RODRIGUEZ MORALES TEMPORARY DVRO, REQUEST, AND NOTICE OF HEARING ON 04/26/2021 |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | *New Filed Case (JBSIS) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.