Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Morales, Jorge Luis Luna, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Morales, Rosa Rodriguez, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
*Review
Judge: Reed, David W. |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Review CCRC Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Continued by Court's Motion | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report Received CCRC Report |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FOR 10/27/2022 HEARING |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation Referred to Child Custody Recommending Counseling with Tjesca Koregelos |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Report Received CCRC Report |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Referral to Family Court Services Mediation Referred to Child Custody Recommending Counseling with Tjesca Koregelos |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Williams, Peter M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.