Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
County Of Placer, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Tobin-Hoagland, Anthony, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Umanzio, Dennis A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2020 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedJuly 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
*Request for Order: Modification
Date: January 05, 2021*Motion
Date: January 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Review PRF OF SERVICE RE: MOTHER BY FATHER TO BE SHOWN TO BE DONE BY THE COUNTY;POSSIBLE MODIFICATION BY MOTHER Judge: Assigned, Judge |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 1/26/21 |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE WILLIAMS - SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 1/26/21 |
|
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED HANNAH ELAINE JENNESS WITH FATHER'S REQUEST FOR ORDER TO MODIFY CHILD SUPPORT, REQUEST FOR CREDITS AND DETERMINATION OF CHILD SUPPORT ARREARS FILED 11/12/20 |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Motion To Determine Arrears;Credits and Modify Child Support cont from 1-5-2021 Judge: Assigned, Judge |
|
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING 1/5/21 |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To JUDGE REED - SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification
Judge: Assigned, Judge |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion Father shall serve his mtn upon the County and mother and filed Proof of Service with the COurt |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order - Modification SUPPORT AND ARREARS FILED BY ANTHONY TOBIN-HOAGLAND |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.