Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Trogin, John Taylor, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Paschich, Lynn Dee, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1236 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference CRC 5.83 Dismissal Hearing Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Marital Status Ends: 05/17/19 Judge: Caraway, Corie J |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default-Entered | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration re Service of Declaration of Disclosure | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment Checklist | |
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing CRC 5.83 Dismissal Hearing |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference *3rd* Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute Order CRC 5.83 Minute Order Date: 8/02/2017 |
|
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference 2nd Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.