Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shifflet-Hayth, Shary, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Sibley, Jesse, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William R. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2013 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Cycle Time228 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: [P REQ: DV/TRO *TEMPS GRANTED* FILED 12/23/13 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P REQ: DV/TRO *TEMPS GRANTED* Desc2: FILED 12/23/13 Desc3: -REISSUED FOR RESPONSE Notice Date: 2014-08-08 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED 9MTH R/O Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: MMH Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information [R] FIREARMS SURRENDER: RECEIPT OF NOTICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order RESPONSE TOPREVENT DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER 2/19/14 HEARING EXPIRES: 11/19/14 CC:BCSO HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
February 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information [R] VERIFICATION THAT PARTY HAS NO GUNS TO BE SURRENDERED OR SOLD Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Application - No Fee NOTICE OF NEW HEARING & ORDER ON REISSUANCE CC:BCSO HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] REQ: DV/TRO *TEMPS GRANTED* Desc2: FILED 12/23/13 Desc3: -REISSUED FOR POS Disp Code: 940 - REISSUED TO 2/19/14 FOR RESPONSE;COFFE Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: MMH Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO JESSIE SIBLEY OF THE DV-109, DV-110, DV-115, DV-116 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Application - No Fee NTC OF NEW HEARING & ORDER ON REISSUANCE CC:BCSO HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.