Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Estrada, Rhiannon N, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Estrada, Rodrigo, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William R. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 26, 2012 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING ON 2/6/13 EXPIRES: 5/3/13 -CCPOR HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BLG | |
February 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] RFO: DV/TRO *TEMPS IN PART* Desc2: FILED 12/27/12 Desc3: -RESPONSIVE DECL TO BE FILED Disp Code: 340 - R/O GRANTED FOR 90 DAYS; EXP 5/3/13 Disp Clerk: BLG Filing Clerk: BLG Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order RESPONSE TO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: DV/TRO TEMPS IN PART Desc2: FILED 12/27/12 Disp Code: 342 - DV ISS CONT 2/6/13; VIP AGRMNT-C/C, VSTN Disp Clerk: BLG Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order PARENTAL AGREEMENT & ORDER (VIP 1/16/13) HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BLG |
|
January 16, 2013 | Docket Event | RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER HEARING (EXPIRES 2/6/13) -CCPOR *PARTIAL TEMPS* HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: BLG | |
January 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF DV/TRO IN PER TO [R] ON 12/31/12 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF HRG Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Court Issued OSC RE: DV/TRO TEMPS GRANTED IN PART PP H/D Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order PETITION TO PREVENT DOMESTIC VIOLENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.