Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vasquez, Juana, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Soto, Raul V, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Steven R. McNelis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven R. McNelis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryLegal Separation W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTY FOR JUANA VASQUEZ OLD ATTY: PRO P NEW ATTY: DAVID HOWARD *MAILED* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum AT-ISSUE MEMO OF [R] RET'D UNFILED; RESP NEEDS TO SEEK LEGAL ADVISE FROM ATTY IN PROBATE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information STATEMENT OF ISUES, CONTENTIONS & PROPOSED DISPOSITION [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration re Service of Declaration of Disclosure DECL RE SERVICE OF FINAL DECL OF DISCLOSURE & INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
April 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum AT-ISSUE MEMO OF [R] RET'D UNFILED; CONSERVATOR CANNOT ACT AS R'S COUNSEL *MAILED* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion hearings - Predispo Desc: [R] MTN: OTHER (SALE OF PROPERTY & Desc2: CONFIRMATION Desc3: FILED 01/10/08 Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED/PROPERTY ORDERED SOLD Disp Clerk: MJO Filing Clerk: JLV Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
February 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING (02/20/08 HRNG) HON. STEVEN R MCNELIS, JUDGE (BSM) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MJO |
|
January 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Initial (DCSS Only) MOTION RE: OTHER (SALE OF PROPERTY & CONFIRMTN) BY[R] *MAILED* Fee Type: W1 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: TLC 495 - $40.00 |
|
January 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order on Court Fee Waiver ORDER ON APP FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES/COSTS *GRANTED TO [P]* Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.