Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Young, Darlene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Young, James, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 27, 2006 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
Time To Trial1924 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions356 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2737 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: STATUS REVIEW ISS: S/S PAYMENTS Disp Code: 399 - HRD Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: JLV Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: FAMILY LAW - LONG CAUSE - 1/2 DAY Desc2: [P] OSC: CONTEMPT FILED 12/03/13 Desc3: ISSUES: CONTEMPT Disp Code: 330 - DISCHARGED, RVW SET 06/25/14 Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Generic Hearing Desc: ISSUES Disp Code: 947 - VACATED Disp Clerk: DAB Filing Clerk: JLV Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference Desc: TRAC --- [1/2 DAY] Desc2: [P] OSC: CONTEMPT FILED 12/3/13 Desc3: [Issues: CONTEMPT] Disp Code: 386 - TRIAL DATE SET Disp Clerk: DAB Filing Clerk: JLV Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: CONTEMPT *AMENDED* Desc2: FILED 12/3/13 Disp Code: 363 - SET FOR TRAC 2/24/14 Disp Clerk: JLV Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Financial Statement FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY STMT FILED PD DENIED BY COMPLIANCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: PSO |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE: OSC RE CONTEMPT AS TO RESPT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB | |
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [P] OSC: CONTEMPT Desc2: FILED 9/26/13 Desc3: -REISSUED FROM 10/30/13- Disp Code: 331 - DISMISSED, WILL HAVE TO BE REFILED Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: JDW Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
December 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information [P] OSC: CONTEMPT *AMENDED* HON. STEPHEN E. BENSON; JUDGE (B07) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW |
|
December 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service *ATTEMPTED* POS TO JAMES YOUNG Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.