Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ingram, Vincent D, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Bevers, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William R. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2004 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTY FOR PETITIONER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: KLN |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL OF ATTY OF RECORD BY N RYKER FOR THE [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION PET Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
November 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PROOF OF MAILING I&E Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Findings and Order After Hearing FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER 11/5/13 HEARING HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [R] RFO: MOD OF C/S Desc2: FILED 9/18/13 Desc3: *$20 FEE DUE SPLIT* Disp Code: 370 - STIPULATION REACHED Disp Clerk: TLC Filing Clerk: TLC Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PROOF OF MAILING AMND I&E Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTY FOR [P]; OLD ATTY: PRO PER NEW ATTY: ROONEY LAW FIRM Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION BY THE [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION BY ROONEY LAW FIRM Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.