Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Payne, Rashell, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Payne, James, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2004 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Cycle Time3962 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Generic Hearing Desc: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING Desc2: EX PARTE APPL FOR TRANSFER - PLACER CO Notice Date: 2015-10-26 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 996 - NOTICE SENT Disp Clerk: ARE Filing Clerk: ARE Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING EX PARTE APPL FOR TRANSFER - PLACER CO Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application without Hearing EXPARTE APPLICATION FOR TRANSFER AND ORDER PLACER COUNTY HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (C10) Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 20.00 Entry Clerk: ARE 494 - $20.00 |
|
June 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING Desc2: P'S MTN FOR CHANGE OF VENUE, TRANSFER Desc3: REJECTED FROM STATE OF IDAHO Notice Date: 2011-06-01 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: SAT Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: REVIEW HEARING P'S MTN FOR CHANGE OF VENUE, TRANSFER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
May 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING Desc2: [P] MTN: CHANGE OF VENUE Desc3: *STATUS* Disp Code: 906 - CONTINUED TO 06/28/11 Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
May 25, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TRANSFERING CASE TO BUTTE CO SUPERIOR CRT FROM THE STATE OF IDAHO Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT | |
May 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING RECORD OF TRANSFER TO CANYON COUNTY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS |
|
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER RE: MOTION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE HON. WILLIAM R PATRICK; JUDGE (B04) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF VENUE (RECORD PREP FOR TRANSFER) CK# 2306 Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 737885 Fee Amount: 50.00 Entry Clerk: TLC 453 - $50.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.