Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Meyer, Sue A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Meyer, Darwyn E, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with James F. Reilley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames F. Reilley Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2004 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions737 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time4319 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney | |
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF QDRO MAILED ON 12/27/11 TO RANDY BAKKE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
October 24, 2011 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information [P] QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR BILL COOK - ATTY PO BOX 91, CHICO, CA 95927 530-893-2220 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference Desc: TRAC --- [1 DAY] Desc2: [P] AT ISSUE FILED 7/6/09 ISS: AF&C] Desc3: USB INVESTMENT ACCOUNT Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR Disp Clerk: DLB Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Reilley, James F |
|
December 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information REPORT OF MEDIATOR: LES HAIT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
|
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference Desc: TRAC --- [1 DAY] Desc2: [P] AT ISSUE FILED 7/6/09 ISS: AF&C Desc3: USB INVESTMENT ACCOUNT Disp Code: 363 - SET FOR TRC & TRIAL 12/21/09 @ 8:30 AM Disp Clerk: DLB Filing Clerk: DLB Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
August 31, 2009 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference Desc: TRAC --- [1 DAY ESTIMATE] Desc2: P'S AT ISSUE FILED 7/06/09 ISS: AF&C Desc3: USB INVESTMENT ACCOUNT Notice Date: 2009-08-06 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 363 - SET FOR TRC & TRIAL 9/28/09 @ 8:30 AM Disp Clerk: DLB Filing Clerk: SAT Judge: Reilley, James F |
|
August 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: TRAC --- [1 DAY ESTIMATE] P'S AT ISSUE FILED 7/06/09 ISS: AF&C Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
July 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information [P] WITNESS LIST Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DLB |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.