Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wiley, Scott R, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Wiley, Kimberli A, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William R. Patrick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam R. Patrick Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2000 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
Time To Trial612 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions322 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time2338 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING, CHANGE OF VENUE Disp Code: 947 - VACATED PER COURT Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: MJO Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
April 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Desc: REVIEW HEARING Desc2: CONFERENCE CALL BETWEEN CA, WV & TX Desc3: COURTS RE: CUSTODY, VISIT, JURISDICTION Disp Code: 399 - CONFERENCE CALL TOOK PLACE/JURSD REMAINS Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: SAT Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTY FOR KENNETH & CHERYL WILEY OLD ATTY: MARGARET BOMBERG; NEW ATTY: PRO PER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SLG |
|
March 09, 2007 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information RECEIPT FOR TRANSFER TO MONONGALIA COUNTY WEST VIRGINIA Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
|
February 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Other hearing Desc: VERIFY TRANSFER TO WEST VIRGINIA Desc2: (VACATE 05/08/07 HEARING???) Disp Code: 399 - CONFIRMED TRANSFER;OFF-CALENDAR Disp Clerk: SAS Filing Clerk: MJO Judge: Patrick, William R |
|
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PROOF OF CERTIFIED MAIL FROM CIRUIT COURT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SKB |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information COPY OF RECEIPT FOR FILE (SENT TO MONONGALIA CO, WEST VIRGINIA)-ORIG TO BE RET'D BY W VA Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MJO |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF TRANSMITTAL OF PAPERS & PLEADINGS (TO MONONGALIA COUNTY, WEST VIRGINIA) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MJO |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF VENUE (TO: FAMILY CRT OF MONONGALIA CO, WEST VIRGINIA)(FILE MLD TO CIRCUIT COURT) Fee Type: CK Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Receipt Number: 564727 Fee Amount: 50.00 Entry Clerk: MJO 453 - $50.00 | |
February 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - 01/23/07 HRNG SENT TO CRAIG LERI Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.