Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Butte, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Butte County Department Of Child Support Services, against Perry, Kathleen S, Perry, Eugene F, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Stephen E. Benson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen E. Benson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 1994 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
OSC hearing Desc: [ ] OSC: DISMISSAL Notice Date: 2013-11-12 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 331 - DISMISSED Disp Clerk: TMS Filing Clerk: CLS Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
November 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: [ ] OSC: DISMISSAL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLS |
|
February 21, 1995 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed SUMMONS RETURNED & FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAN |
|
December 07, 1994 | Docket Event |
Legacy Docketable Information PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE(170.6) JUDGE RUTHERFORD BY: DA/FSD Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JAN |
|
December 07, 1994 | Docket Event |
First Paper Filed - Fee COMPLAINT SUMMONS ISSUED (2) Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 182.00 Entry Clerk: JAN 40 - $0.00 98 - $0.00 37 - $20.00 46 - $3.00 11 - $3.00 36 - $3.00 9 - $135.00 10 - $18.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.