Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Duplechan, Israel, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Duplechan, Elise Noui, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Reporter's Transcript Filed | |
September 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order Further Court Trial Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
September 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Further Court Trial
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Evidentiary EVIDENTIARY HEARING Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR F320-721 Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Denied Restraining Order TRO DENIED Notes: - TRO DENIED PENDING HEARING |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
FYI - RELATED CASE ON CALENDAR FL19-1870
Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.