Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Contreras, Angelina Vasquez, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Contreras, Margarita, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time29 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
575 HRG RE: DV TRO Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
*Interpreter Required During Hearing INTERPRETER REQUIRED Notes: SPANISH FOR PETITIONER |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE TRO Notes: REISSUE TRO - ORDER ON REQ TO CONT HRG 07/02/2020 |
|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (in Person) (CLETS) (Domestic Violence) PRF OF SERV DV Notes: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; SERVED RESP WITH DV-109, DV-100, BLANK DV-120, AND DV-100 ON 6/7/2020 |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) OSC & TRO (CLETS) Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDR |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing NTC OF HEARING Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order APP/DECL OSC/TRO-DV |
|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE MAGUIRE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.