Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Khosravi, Lavinia Niloufar, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Par, Selahattin, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Cortes, Sonia presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCortes, Sonia Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time70 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Maguire, Daniel P. |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (in Person) (CLETS) (Domestic Violence) PRF OF SERV DV Notes: PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE DOMESTIC VIOLENCE TO SELAHATTIN PAR WITH TRO NOTICE OF HEARING AND ORDER ON REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING ON 7/20/20 |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
FAMILY LAW Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Party's Motion CONT BY PARTY'S MTN Notes: PETN |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE TRO Notes: REISSUE TRO - ORDER ON REQ TO CONT HRG |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
575 HRG RE: DV TRO Request for Order - DV/TRO HEARING RE: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE REQUEST Judge: Cortes, Sonia |
|
June 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Continued by Court's Motion CONT BY COURT'S MTN Notes: NO POS |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) OSC & TRO (CLETS) Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDR |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Assignment ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE Notes: FAP; JUDGE CORTES |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO JUDGE Notes: TRO AND NOTICE OF HEARING SENT TO JUDGE CORTES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.