Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Vang, Mai, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Moreno, Paul, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Judge, Assigned presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge, Assigned Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2007 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE /TRO NO APPEARANCE TRO DISMISSED Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: PAUL MORENO WITH REISSUE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DV), TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING, REQUEST FOR ORDER, ANSWER TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ON 2/6/2007 |
|
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: PETER SAPUNOR |
|
February 21, 2007 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: LETTER FROM PAUL MORENO REQUESTING THAT THE HEARING O N 2/28/07 BE POSTPONED UNTIL HE IS RELEASED FROM SACR AMENTO CO JAIL AND CAN ATTEND. | |
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: PAUL MORENO WITH ATTACHMENT, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING, REQUEST FOR ORDER, ANSWER TO TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ON 1/18/ 2007 |
|
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request to Continue Hearing - DV REISSUE OSC Notes: REISSUE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: calendar file away; copies to advocate; copy faxed to woodland pd |
|
January 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause OSC/TRO (DV) PETITONER PRESENT W/SADVC ADVOCATE FORD PRESENT RESPONDENT NOT PRESENT TEMP RTO CONTINUED TO 2-28-07 8:30AM DEPT 11 OSC/TRO Judge: Warriner, Thomas E |
|
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order APP/DECL OSC/TRO-DV |
|
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order (CLETS-TRO) OSC & TRO (CLETS) Notes: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.