Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mendoza, Otoniel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mendoza Barajas, Jocelyn, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Jacobson, Jack M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJacobson, Jack M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management151 days |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedJune 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order- Reschedule | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Family Court Services Assessment Worksheet | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Order- FL-300 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.