Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Liu, Yunzhao, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Byard, Bryan, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDistaso, Joseph Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2020 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing with Children
Judge: Jacobson, Jack M |
|
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Denied Filing No Hearing Given | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Request to Continue (Reissue) DV | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Domestic Violence Hearing with Children
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Domestic Violence Filing | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Temp Restraining Order | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential Investigative Summary |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.