Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fernandes, Alexandria Lynn, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Massengill, Jason Lee-Harley, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDistaso, Joseph Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2021 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition For Custody And Support |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Order
Judge: Distaso, Joseph Richard |
|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Request for Order- FL-300 | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration (Petitioner) | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Requested | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Petition for Custody and Support | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Confidential Declaration | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.