Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 06, 1995 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event | COPIES OF DOCUMENTS Notes: COPIES OF DOCUMENTS TO: YOLO COUNTY DCSS | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: OF 03/25/13 |
|
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event |
Warrant of Body Attachment Issued WARR BDY ATTACH ISS Notes: WARRANT OF BODY ATTACHMENT ISSUED |
|
March 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
*Review DEF NP DCSS ATTY WARD BENCH WARRANT ORDERED $5,000.00 DAYTIME SERVICE ONLY,EXPIRES IN ONE YEAR DCSS TO PREPARE ORDER Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: d12 |
|
January 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Warrant Filed WARR BDY ATTACH FILD Notes: WARRANT OF BODY ATTACHMENT FILED-ISSUED: 5/21/12 |
|
November 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: SHORT FORM FOR 11/13/12 |
|
November 21, 2012 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING | |
November 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
*Review DEF ERIN CHANEY PRESENT DCSS ANDERSON DEF ORDERED TO APPEAR ON 03/25/13 AT 1:30 D12 FOR WORK SEARCH REVIEW DEBTOR EXAM HELD TODAY-ERIN CHANEY SWORN AND EXAMINEDDEF ORDERED TO SEARCH FOR WORK AT LEAST 15 JOBS DUE TO DCSS BY 12/28/12 AND ON THE LAST DAY OF EVERY MONTHDEF TO GIVE WRITTEN NTC WITH IN 10 DAYS OF ANY EMPLOYMENT OR ADDRESS CHANGES. DCSS TO PREPARE A FORMAL ORDER. Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Warrant of Body Attachment Issued WARR BDY ATTACH ISS Notes: WARRANT OF BODY ATTACHMENT ISSUED Action: WRE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.