Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 1995 |
CategoryOther Family Law |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: FILED BY YOLO CO DCSS |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: DEPT 12 BOX/SUSAN BERRY |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing ORD AFT HEARING Notes: OF 10/26/10 |
|
November 08, 2010 | Docket Event | RECEIVED* Notes: SHORT FORM ORDER AFTER HEARING FROM YOLO COUNTY DCSS | |
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL* Notes: OF PAYMENT HISTORY BY DCSS |
|
October 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Order to Show Cause DCSS PATRICK WARD DEFENDANT MOTHER'S REQUEST IS GRANTED NO ONGOING SUPPORT IS ORDERED; WAGE ASSIGNMENT OF $100.00 TOWARDS ARREARS; COURT DETERMINES ARREARS AT $15,943.73 PRINCIPAL & INTEREST THROUGH 10/25/10. Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration RESPONSIVE DECL* Notes: TO OSC OR NTC OF MOTION (FILED BY DCSS ATTY, PATRICK R WARD) |
|
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: FILE (DOCS FILED 10/06/2010) |
|
October 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: MAILED: RESPONSIVE DECLARATION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE OR NTC OF MOTION, TO: AMANDA J ONTIVEROS, ON 10/05/2010 |
|
September 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS PERSONAL* Notes: SERVED: COUNTY OF YOLO DCSS W/ ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, APPLICATION FOR ORDER & SUPPORTING DECLARATION, INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION, ON 09/29/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.