Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Marissa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Zepeda, Jesus C, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Dennis A. Umanzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis A. Umanzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 17, 1995 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC OF W/DRAWL ATTY Notes: WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR RESPONDENT JESUS C. ZEPEDA/LEZLEY A. WATTS |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
*Request for Order: Modification DCSS COLIN ANDERSON PETITIONER (APPEARED OFF RECORD) RESPONDENT W/ATTY LEZLEY WATTS OFF CAL; STIP REACHED AND SUBMITTED Judge: Umanzio, Dennis A. |
|
June 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation STIP AND ORDER Notes: STIPULATION AND ORDER OBLIGOR IS RESPONDENT PARTIES AGREE TO GUIDELINE SUPPORT OF $900.00 PER MONTH FOR CHILD JESSICA ZEPEDA BEGINNING 5/1/10 INTEREST ACCRUES ON ENTIRE PRINCIPAL BALANCE OWING OBLIGOR TO PROVIDE HEALTH INSURANCE |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee RESPONSE* Notes: RESPONSE TO GOVERNMENTAL NOTICE OF MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney SUBST OF ATTORNEY Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY - LEZLEY A. WATTS OF BARTHOL OMEW IN PLACE OF JESUS C. ZEPEDA IN PRO PER |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS BY MAILING* Notes: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY ETAL - 5/28/10 MARISSA GARCI A - YOLO COUNTY DCSS |
|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: FILED BY JESUS C. ZEPEDA RESPONDENT |
|
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: (FILED BY PETN MARISSA GARCIA) |
|
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: HOLDING DOCS AT JODY'S DESK UNTIL FILE IS RETRIEVED FROM MATMOR (DOCS FILED 04/27/2010) |
|
April 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Declaration INC & EXP DECL Notes: (FILED BY RESP JESUS C ZEPEDA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.