Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mertz, Kenneth, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mertz, Terry R, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Petre, Donna M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePetre, Donna M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 1991 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: BEAMER FILE AWAY |
|
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ | |
August 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: COSTS: $52.00, INTEREST: $1,591.94 |
|
March 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued WRIT ISSUED* $ Notes: YOLO COUNTY FOR $10,037.00 |
|
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs MEMO/COST/INT/CREDS Notes: FOR COSTS OF $22.00 |
|
March 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To DOC SENT TO* Notes: TO LORI'S HOLD SHELF WITH UNPROCESSED WRIT OF EXECUTI ON - ORDERED FILE FROM BEAMER |
|
January 25, 2007 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT ISSUED $ Notes: FOR AMOUNT OF $10,000.00 PLUS 2% OF PROFIT OF SALE OF PROPERTY: RE FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 1/ 11/07 | |
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Findings & Order After Hearing FIND & ORD AFT HRG Notes: FINDINGS & ORDER AFTER HEARING (Hearing of 9-7-06) |
|
September 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Motion COUNSEL FOR RESPONDENT PRESENT. COURT GRANTS MOTION AS PRAYED. Judge: Petre, Donna M |
|
August 23, 2006 | Docket Event |
*Motion
Judge: Petre, Donna M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.