Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Silicon Bay Property Management Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Mohabbat, Amir, Mohabbat, Sohaila, in the jurisdiction of Alameda County. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts with Willie Lott, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWillie Lott, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 29, 2008 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlameda County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Cycle Time820 days |
Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Judge Frank Roesch Filed for Silicon Bay Property Management
Date: 2008-06-17T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Silicon Bay Property Management Inc.
Date: 2008-05-29T00:00:00Civil OSC Commenced and Completed
Date: September 12, 2008Memo To Set Filed for Plaintiff
Date: 2008-06-17T00:00:00Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Continued
Date: 2008-07-01T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Filed
Date: 2008-05-29T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed for Amir Mohabbat, Sohaila Mohabbat
Date: 2008-06-09T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Amir Mohabbat Filed
Date: 2008-06-13T00:00:00Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Judge Frank Roesch Denied
Date: 2008-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Service on all un-named tenants/occupants Filed
Date: 2008-06-13T00:00:00Fee Waiver Hearing 06/23/2008 02:00 PM D- FHO
Date: 2008-06-10T00:00:00Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Judge Frank Roesch Denied
Date: 2008-06-19T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed
Date: August 27, 2010Notice of Delayed Access to UD Case Issued
Date: 2008-05-30T00:00:00Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sohaila Mohabbat Filed
Date: 2008-06-13T00:00:00Stipulation Re: Conditional Settlement Granted
Date: August 04, 2008Application Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Amir Mohabbat Granted
Date: 2008-06-24T00:00:00Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Judge Frank Roesch Filed for Silicon Bay Property Managem
Date: 2008-05-29T00:00:00Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed
Date: 2008-05-29T00:00:00Application Re: Waiver of Court Fees and Costs As to Sohaila Mohabbat Granted
Date: 2008-06-24T00:00:00Complaint Unlawful Detainer Dismissed
Date: September 12, 2008Unlawful Detainer Court Trial 07/01/2008 11:30 AM D- 608
Date: 2008-06-23T00:00:00Unlawful Detainer Court Trial Commenced and Completed
Date: 2008-07-02T00:00:00Rejection Letter Issued on Default and Default Clerk's UD Judgment (CCP 1169)
Date: 2008-06-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.