Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Donnelly, Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Donnelly, Kimiko, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Russell S. Roeca presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryPetition For Dissolution With Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 | Hearing |
Request For Order Child Custody, Visitation (Parenting Time), [X] Access To Accounts (Please See #8 Below)
Judge: RUSSELL S. ROECA |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER CHILD CUSTODY, VISITATION (PARENTING TIME), [X] ACCESS TO ACCOUNTS (PLEASE SEE #8 BELOW) ON OCT-19-2023 OFF CALENDAR - PER ADOPTED TENTATIVE RULING. | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR OCT-19-2023 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 403 | |
August 23, 2023 | Hearing | MEDIATOR JJ | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULED FOR MEDIATION WITH MEDIATOR JJ IN DEPT 402 ON AUG-23-2023 AT 01:30 PM | |
August 07, 2023 | Hearing |
Request For Order Child Custody, Visitation (Parenting Time), [X] Access To Accounts (Please See #8 Below)
Judge: RUSSELL S. ROECA |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CUSTODY/VISITATION SET FOR HEARING ON OCT-19-2023 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 403. OTHER MATTERS SET FOR HEARING ON OCT-19-2023 AT 9:00 AM IN DEPT. 403. | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR AUG-07-2023 09:00 AM FOR DEPT 403 | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 70527640) FILED BY RESPONDENT DONNELLY, KIMIKO | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL (TRANSACTION ID # 70527640) FILED BY RESPONDENT DONNELLY, KIMIKO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.