Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Florida Department Of Revenue, Obo: Paul, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Rodgers, Bonnie, in the jurisdiction of San Francisco County. This case was filed in San Francisco County Superior Courts Superior with Rebecca L. Wightman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRebecca L. Wightman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2015 |
CategoryRegister Of Out Of State Support Order |
Last RefreshedSeptember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Francisco County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Cycle Time1360 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2019 | Hearing |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (GOVERNMENTAL) Seek Work
Judge: REBECCA L. WIGHTMAN |
|
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | MINI MINUTES FOR MAY-15-2019 08:30 AM FOR DEPT 416 | |
May 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (GOVERNMENTAL) SEEK WORK ON MAY-15-2019 OFF CALENDAR | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR SEEK WORK FILED 04/03/19 - PERSON SERVED - BONNIE J RODGERS; PAUL G GORMAN | |
April 03, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (GOVERNMENTAL) SEEK WORK FILED BY OTHER COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO HEARING SET FOR MAY-15-2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 416 | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES NOTICE OF REGISTRATION OF OUT-OF STATE SUPPORT ORDER FILED 8/24/15. NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT- SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE. SERVED TO BONNIE J RODGERS; PAUL G GORMAN | |
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE REGARDING PAYMENT OF SUPPORT - SUBSTITUTION OF PAYEE FILED BY DEPARTMENT OF CHILD SUPPORT SERVICES (IN) | |
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event | REGISTER OF OUT OF STATE SUPPORT ORDER DCSS#200000001679883 FILED BY PETITIONER STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, OBO: PAUL GORMAN, AS TO RESPONDENT RODGERS, BONNIE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.