Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
J.G. Wentworth Originations Of California Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Felton James Richard, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with Benny C. Osorio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBenny C. Osorio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt Finding - (Granted) |
Case Cycle Time42 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet -
Date: October 05, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case -
Date: October 05, 2018Proof of Service by Mail -
Date: October 15, 2018Notice of Hearing on Petition - for Approval for Transfer of Payment Rights
Date: October 05, 2018Request For Copies
Date: October 25, 2018Other - - Other - Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights
Date: November 20, 2018Request For Copies
Date: December 19, 2018Request For Copies
Date: December 20, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Request For Copies; Filed by: Clerk | |
December 20, 2018 | Request For Copies | ||
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Copies Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 20, 2018 | Hearing |
Request For Copies Filed by Clerk |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Request For Copies; Filed by: Clerk | |
December 19, 2018 | Request For Copies | ||
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Copies Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 19, 2018 | Hearing |
Request For Copies Filed by Clerk |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Other - Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights; Signed and Filed by: J.G. Wentworth Originations of California, LLC (Petitioner) | |
November 20, 2018 | Other - - Other - Order Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.