Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Potter, Lisa J, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Potter, Geoffrey, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 22, 2006 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa (Fc4900) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE STIP AND ORDER SERVED ON THE [P] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
March 22, 2011 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE STIP AND ORDER SERVED ON THE [R] Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TMS | |
March 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order STIP & ORDER Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 20.00 Entry Clerk: TMS 494 - $20.00 |
|
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 12/14/10 AS TO LISA AWALT Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW | |
December 28, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED 12/14/10 AS TO GEOFFREY POTTER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JDW | |
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER HRG 12/14/10 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAT |
|
December 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: [DCSS] MTN FOR OTHER: DET/SET ARREARS Desc2: FILED 10/18/10 Disp Code: 340 - GRANTED, ARREARS DET/ORDERED Disp Clerk: SAT Filing Clerk: TLC Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF NTC OF MTN ETC...AS TO [P] BY MAIL 10/18/10 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF NTC OF MTN ETC...AS TO [R] BY MAIL 10/18/10 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: TLC |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) [DCSS] MTN FOR OTHER: DET/SET ARREARS Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: TLC 495 - $40.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.