Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
San Mateo, The County Of, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Tabares, Michael Bruce, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with David E. Gunn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E. Gunn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2001 |
CategoryDcss - Uifsa (Fc4900) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS MINUTES AND ORDER/JUDGMENT - FAMILY SUPPORT OF 10-16-07 HON. DAVID E GUNN, COMMISSIONER (B10) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DAB |
|
October 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial Desc: DCSS MTN FOR DETERMINE & SET ARREARS Desc2: *FILED 07/19/07* Disp Code: 378 - ARREARS SET Disp Clerk: DAB Filing Clerk: TMS Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE NTC OF MTN COURT HRG 10/16/07 SERVED ON BOTH PARTIES BY MAIL Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: DKW | |
July 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Other (Non DCSS) NOTICE OF MOTION RE: DETERMINE & SET ARREARS FILED BY DCSS Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 40.00 Entry Clerk: TMS 495 - $40.00 |
|
November 17, 2005 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED YUBA Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 7.00 Entry Clerk: ARE 415 - $7.00 |
|
January 14, 2002 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF APP AND PRDER TO PAY FTF, STMT OF REGIS SERVED ON MICHAEL TABARES & BEVERLY BAILLARGE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: ARE |
|
January 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
Notice APP & ORDER TO PAY THRU FTF & APPT DCSS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMD |
|
January 03, 2002 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - Issued ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED BUTTE, SAN LUIS OBISPO, SAN MATEO Fee Type: W2 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 3 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 21.00 Entry Clerk: MMD 40 - $21.00 |
|
December 21, 2001 | Docket Event | STATEMENT FOR REGISTRATION OF FOREIGN SUPPORT ORDER & CLERK'S NOTICE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMD | |
December 21, 2001 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK HEALTH INSURANCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.