Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lara, Jackie, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Pro Per, against Dorsey, Robert, Tyler, Kathie, represented by Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with William O. Scott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam O. Scott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2004 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Time To Trial27 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1152 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: SAP | |
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO SIT AS JUDGE PRO TEM Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH | |
January 12, 2005 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Desc: COURT TRIAL - MUNI COURT/CIVIL Desc2: U.D. Notice Date: 2004-12-29 00:00:00.0000000 Disp Code: 240 - DISMISSED AFTER TRIAL STARTED W/O PREJ Disp Clerk: MMH Filing Clerk: MMH Judge: Scott, William O |
|
December 29, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: COURT TRIAL - MUNI COURT/CIVIL U.D. Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
December 23, 2004 | Docket Event |
Memorandum MEMO TO SET FILED BY: PLTFF (X) COURT ( ) JURY - ... DAY(S) 1/2 HR(S) Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF SUMMONS & COMPL ON KATHIE TYLER 12/17/04-PER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
December 22, 2004 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service POS OF SUMMONS & COMPL ON ROBERT DORSEY 12/17/04-PER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
December 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees APP FOR ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DEFT:ROB DORSEY Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
December 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Request to Waive Court Fees APP FOR ORDER WAIVING COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DEFT:KATHIE TYLER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMH |
|
December 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Answer - Response - Denial - Limited up to $10,000 ANSWER FILED W/POS TO PLTFF (UNDER 10K) Fee Type: W1 Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 152.00 Entry Clerk: MMH 11 - $2.00 279 - $47.00 37 - $29.00 36 - $8.00 46 - $3.00 280 - $8.00 284 - $25.00 324 - $20.00 329 - $10.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.