Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Laura Silva, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Aldo Vasquez, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management182 days |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2020 |
Category1St Amended Petition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED PETITION FILED | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED SUMMONS FILED BY LAURA SILVA | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | RESTORE FORMER NAME: NOT REQUESTED | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 31 | |
July 28, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.