Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Susan Patricia Thompson, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Randolph Dale Thompson, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management186 days |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2020 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | HEARING ON REQUEST FOR DOMESTIC VIOLENCE RESTRAINING ORDER FILED BY SUSAN PATRICIA THOMPSON FILED ON 08/05/20 | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT HEARING (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) FILED BY SUSAN PATRICIA THOMPSON | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER (DENIED) FILED BY SUSAN PATRICIA THOMPSON | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: EX PARTE NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY SUSAN PATRICIA THOMPSON | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDER (DOMESTIC VIOLENCE) [SUPPLEMENTAL] FILED | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 35 | |
July 24, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY - ORIGINAL RETAINED IN COURT FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.