Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Shalini Gupta, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ashutosh Gupta, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management181 days |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2020 |
CategoryPetition |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | JURISDICTION DATE: 08/04/20 | |
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND PETITION OF GUPTA SERVED ON ASHUTOSH GUPTA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/04/20 FILED | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY SHALINI GUPTA (PETITION OR OTHER FIRST PAPER, INCLUDING A JOINT PETITION, FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE OR DOMESTIC PARTNERSHIP, LEGAL SEPARATION OR NULLITY) | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE ASSIGNED TO COURTROOM 32 | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND FAMILY LAW STATUS CONFERENCE | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) FILED | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.