Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jevon P Lazarre, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Qualikqua Lazarre, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management180 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2019 |
CategoryPetition |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time544 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS (POST JUDGMENT) - MOTION TO SET-ASIDE PER CCP 473(B) FILED BY QUALIKQUA LAZARRE FILED ON 08/09/19 | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | STATUS CONFERENCE | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY QUALIKQUA LAZARRE | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED AS TO QUALIKQUA LAZARRE | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ORDERS (POST JUDGMENT) - MOTION TO SET-ASIDE PER CCP 473(B) FILED BY QUALIKQUA LAZARRE FILED ON 08/09/19 | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTERED AND NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION OR LEGAL SEPARATION (FAMILY CODE 2336) FILED | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | MARITAL STATUS ENDING DATE: 08/29/19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.