Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bonnacorsi, Luca, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Julia L. Scrogin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulia L. Scrogin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2018 |
Category(39) Unlimited Other Judicial Review |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Case Cycle Time281 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Pardon | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Delivery | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Delivery | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order (Cover Sheet - Electronic Filing) | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Pardon | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition
Judge: Scrogin, Julia L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.