Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of Yuba County. This case was filed in Yuba County Superior Courts with Stephen W. Berrier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephen W. Berrier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management403 days |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2015 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationYuba County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time403 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Berrier, Stephen W |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal - Entire Action | |
December 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Check Trust Mailed to Defendant | |
March 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerks Trust Refund Request | |
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Appeal - Abandon Appeal | |
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Conversion Close | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Letter Received | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Opposition - No Fee | |
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.